THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 18:59:15 PM
Yokogawa, Tomonori Alexander
CPSO#:
99678
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
03 Jul 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
03 Jul 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of British Columbia Faculty o, 2012
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 128
370 Bayview Drive
Barrie ON L4N 7L3
Phone: (705) 726-0173
Fax: (705) 725-9575
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Health Sciences North |
Sudbury |
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre |
Barrie |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:15 Jun 2015 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. TOMONORI ALEXANDER YOKOGAWA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YOKOGAWA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 17 Dec 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2013 to 15 Dec 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 16 Dec 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2014 to 14 Dec 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 17 Dec 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 14 Dec 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 03 Jun 2015 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 03 Jul 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 03 Jul 2015 |