THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 1:09:15 AM
Gonzalez Martinez, Fernando
CPSO#:
99677
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
18 Aug 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
18 Aug 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Spanish
Education: National Autonomous Univ of Guadalajara, 2002
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Unit B05B
8760 Jane Street
Concord ON L4K 0E8
Phone: 905-237-4623
Fax: 905-237-5098
Electoral District: 05
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - New Jersey
USA - New York
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation |
Effective:11 Dec 2012 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 11 Dec 2012 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 11 Dec 2012 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 10 Jun 2014 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 10 Jun 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 18 Aug 2014 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 19 Aug 2014 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 18 Aug 2014 |
|
Active |