THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 18:24:28 PM
Keilman, Jeffrey Robert
CPSO#:
99674
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
07 Jun 2023
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
16 Jul 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 2009
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Quebec
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:30 Jun 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 17 Dec 2012 to 13 Jan 2013
EL - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Dec 2015
CF - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 17 Dec 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 13 Jan 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 16 Jul 2014 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 07 Jun 2023 |