THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 5:24:06 AM
Chen, Breanna Ashley
CPSO#:
99673
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
25 Aug 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicin, 2011
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Children's Hospital of Western ON
London Health Sciences Centre
800 Commissioner's Road East
London ON N6A 5W9
Phone: 519-685-8500 Ext. 56075
Fax: 519-685-8156
Electoral District: 02
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
London Health Sciences Centre,Children's Hospital of Western Ontario |
London |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:30 Jun 2015 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. BREANNA ASHLEY CHEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHEN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 17 Dec 2012 to 13 Jan 2013
EL - Pediatrics
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 06 May 2013 to 02 Jun 2013
EL - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 15 Jul 2013 to 26 Jul 2013
EL - Pediatrics
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 25 Aug 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 05 Oct 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Pediatrics
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2016 to 04 Oct 2016
CF - Pediatrics
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 17 Dec 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 13 Jan 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 06 May 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 02 Jun 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jul 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 26 Jul 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 25 Aug 2013 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2015 |