THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 17:11:33 PM
Andalib, Ali
CPSO#:
99668
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
06 Dec 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
06 Dec 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Farsi, French
Education: McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 2008
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Oshawa Clinic
117 King Street East
Seventh Floor
Oshawa ON L1H 1B9
Phone: 905-721-3594
Fax: 905-721-4338
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site |
Oshawa |
St Michael's Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2012 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Cardiology |
Effective:02 Oct 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ALI ANDALIB may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ANDALIB is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
CF - Cardiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 06 Dec 2012 |