THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 9:35:25 AM
Stingu-Baxter, Miroslava
CPSO#:
99623
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 Jan 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
24 Jul 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Romanian, Russian
Education: N.Testemitanu State Medical and Pharma, 1991
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
70 Colony Farm Road
Forensic Psychiatric Hospital
Coquitlam BC V3C 5X9
Phone: (604) 524-7700
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
British Columbia
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:14 May 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MIROSLAVA STINGU-BAXTER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STINGU-BAXTER is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 26 Nov 2012 to 31 Dec 2012
EL - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 15 Jan 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Aug 2014
CF - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 26 Nov 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jan 2013 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Jul 2014 |