THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 5:44:35 AM
Razack, Tamazadeene
CPSO#:
99619
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
14 Nov 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
14 Nov 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Spanish
Education: Superior Inst of Med Sciences of Havana, 1989
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Englehart Family Health Team
63 5th Street
Englehart ON P0J 1H0
Phone: (705) 544-2321
Fax: (705) 544-5224
Electoral District: 08
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:c/o Dr. Allen Boettcher
Bingham Memorial Hospital
507 8th Avenue
P O Box 70
Matheson ON P0K 1N0
Date Received: 10 Nov 2017
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Anson General Hospital |
Iroquois Falls |
Bingham Memorial Hospital |
Matheson |
Lady Minto Hospital |
Cochrane |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:11 Dec 2012 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. TAMAZADEENE RAZACK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAZACK is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 14 Nov 2012 |
Concerns
Source:
Compliance and Monitoring Department
Active Date: September 20, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.
Download Full Document (PDF)