THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 7:41:31 AM
Vellanki, Venkat Sainaresh
CPSO#:
99616
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of
30 Jun 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
19 Feb 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Mysore University, 1996
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
India
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 12 Nov 2012 to 24 Jan 2013
PEAP - CF - Nephrology
University of Toronto, 25 Jan 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Nephrology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Nephrology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 11 Nov 2014
CF - Nephrology
University of Toronto, 12 Nov 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Nephrology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 24 Jan 2016
CF - Nephrology
University of Toronto, 19 Feb 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Nephrology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 13 Nov 2012 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 25 Jan 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 24 Jan 2016 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 19 Feb 2016 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Jun 2016 |