THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 1:38:24 AM
AlHarbi, Khalid Hamed
CPSO#:
99612
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of
24 Sep 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
17 Dec 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: King Abdul Aziz University, 2009
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 20 Nov 2012 to 03 Dec 2012
PEAP - R - Cardiology
University of Ottawa, 04 Dec 2012 to 14 Jan 2013
EL - Cardiology
University of Ottawa, 15 Jan 2013 to 11 Mar 2013
EL - Infectious Diseases
University of Ottawa, 12 Mar 2013 to 06 May 2013
EL - Nephrology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 30 Jul 2013 to 13 Aug 2013
PEAP - R - Gastroenterology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 14 Aug 2013 to 26 Aug 2013
EL - Gastroenterology
University of Toronto, 27 Aug 2013 to 09 Sep 2013
PEAP - R - Respiratory Medicine
University of Toronto, 10 Sep 2013 to 22 Sep 2013
EL - Respiratory Medicine
University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2013 to 21 Oct 2013
EL - Rheumatology
University of Toronto, 22 Oct 2013 to 18 Nov 2013
EL - Endocrinology and Metabolism
University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2015 to 16 Dec 2015
PEAP - CF - Gastroenterology
University of Toronto, 17 Dec 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Gastroenterology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Sep 2016
CF - Gastroenterology
University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
CF - Gastroenterology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
CF - Gastroenterology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2018 to 24 Sep 2018
CF - Gastroenterology
University of Toronto, 25 Sep 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
CF - Gastroenterology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2019 to 24 Sep 2019
CF - Gastroenterology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 20 Nov 2012 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 04 Dec 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 06 May 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jul 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 13 Aug 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 14 Aug 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 26 Aug 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 27 Aug 2013 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 10 Sep 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 18 Nov 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Oct 2015 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 17 Dec 2015 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 24 Sep 2019 |