THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 1:39:11 AM
Lam, Jennifer Ying-Kee
CPSO#:
99602
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jun 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
01 Jun 2020
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2011
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
800 Commissioners Rd E
London ON N6A 5W9
Phone: 519-685-8454
Fax: 519 685 8241
Electoral District: 02
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Alberta
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
London Health Sciences Centre,Children's Hospital of Western Ontario |
London |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2016 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Pediatric General Surgery |
Effective:30 Oct 2018 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JENNIFER YING-KEE LAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAM is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 19 Nov 2012 to 16 Dec 2012
EL - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 07 Jul 2014 to 03 Aug 2014
EL - Pediatric General Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 19 Nov 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 16 Dec 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 07 Jul 2014 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 03 Aug 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jun 2020 |