THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 1:45:09 AM
Walker, Kathryn Craigen
CPSO#:
99579
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Mar 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
01 Mar 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Spartan Health Sciences University, 2010
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Grandview Medical Centre Family
Health Team
167 Hespeler Road
Cambridge ON N1R 3H7
Phone: (519) 623-4200
Electoral District: 03
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Monkhouse Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 17 2017
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:11 Dec 2012 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. KATHRYN CRAIGEN WALKER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WALKER is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 02 Nov 2012 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 02 Nov 2012 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 01 Nov 2015 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Mar 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Mar 2013 |