THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 7:21:05 AM
Barisic, Dusan
CPSO#:
99576
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Nov 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
01 Nov 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Croatian, English, Serbian
Education: Wayne State University School of Medicin, 2006
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Windsor Regional Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
1995 Lens Avenue
Metropolitan Campus
Windsor ON N8W 1L9
Phone: (519) 985-2606
Electoral District: 01
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Michigan
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Emergency Medicine |
Effective:01 Nov 2012 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Nov 2012 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Nov 2012 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 30 Apr 2014 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 29 Apr 2014 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 15 May 2014 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 15 May 2014 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 15 May 2014 |
|
Active |