THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 16:09:02 PM
Hatlapa-Sial, Karolina Maria
CPSO#:
99575
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Nov 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
01 Nov 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Hatlapa, Karolina Maria (used until: 05 Jul 2022 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Polish
Education: Academy of Medicine, Lodz, 2005
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
25 Woodbine Downs Blvd
Etobicoke ON M9W 6N5
Phone: 4167412273
Electoral District: 10
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:01 Nov 2012 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Nov 2012 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Nov 2012 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 09 Sep 2013 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 06 Jan 2014 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 17 Apr 2014 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 17 Apr 2014 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 17 Apr 2014 |
|
Active |