THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 3:45:52 AM
Johnson, Sonia Clare
CPSO#:
99571
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
31 Oct 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
31 Oct 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Ross University School of Medicine, 2008
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1-1915 Ironoak Way
Oakville ON L6H 0N1
Phone: 289-644-2822
Electoral District: 04
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:31 Oct 2012 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 31 Oct 2012 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 31 Oct 2012 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 30 Apr 2014 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 04 Feb 2014 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 15 May 2014 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 21 May 2014 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 15 May 2014 |
|
Active |