THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 16:46:48 PM
Lyons, Owen Daniel
CPSO#:
99569
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
29 Feb 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
29 Feb 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: National University of Ireland, 2000
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Women's College Hospital
Division of Respirology
76 Grenville Street
Toronto ON M5S 1B2
Phone: (416) 323-6137
Fax: 416 323 6132
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sinai Health System |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site |
Toronto |
Women's College Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Respirology |
Effective:29 Feb 2016 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 30 Oct 2012 to 21 Jan 2013
PEAP - CF - Respiratory Medicine
University of Toronto, 22 Jan 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Respiratory Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 02 Nov 2013
CF - Respiratory Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Respiratory Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 01 Nov 2015
CF - Respiratory Medicine
University of Toronto, 02 Nov 2015 to 29 Feb 2016
CF - Respiratory Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 30 Oct 2012 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 22 Jan 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 02 Nov 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Oct 2014 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 29 Feb 2016 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 29 Feb 2016 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 23 Mar 2017 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration |
Expiry Date: 28 Feb 2025 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 10 Aug 2023 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 10 Aug 2023 |
|
Active |