THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
07/05/24 11:09:33 AM
Takeuchi, Hiroyoshi
CPSO#:
99558
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of
31 Mar 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
17 Nov 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Chiba Medical University, 2001
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Japan
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 24 Oct 2012 to 15 Jan 2013
PEAP - CF - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 16 Jan 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Mar 2015
CF - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Apr 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 31 Mar 2017
CF - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 24 Oct 2012 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 16 Jan 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 17 Nov 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 17 Nov 2015 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 31 Mar 2017 |