THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 8:34:14 AM
Kulkarni, Jyothi
CPSO#:
99546
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
05 Feb 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
05 Feb 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Kannada, Marathi, Telugu
Education: Kakatiya Medical College, 1996
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
310 King St E
Sacntuary
Kitchener ON N2G 2L3
Phone: 5197454404
Electoral District: 03
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:11 Jan 2013 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JYOTHI KULKARNI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KULKARNI is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 19 Oct 2012 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 19 Oct 2012 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 01 Jan 2013 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 11 Jun 2013 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 27 Mar 2014 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 05 Feb 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 05 Feb 2015 |