THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 9:24:12 AM
Lopez de Lara Gutierrez, Catalina
CPSO#:
99543
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
30 Aug 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Aug 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Spanish
Education: Universidad Autonoma de Guadalajara, 2001
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Baycrest Centre
Department of Psychiatry
3560 Bathurst Street
Suite 4W02C
Toronto ON M6A 2E1
Phone: (416) 785-2500 Ext. 3359
Fax: 647-788-4394
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Baycrest Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:29 Jul 2013 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Geriatric Psychiatry |
Effective:31 Dec 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. CATALINA LOPEZ DE LARA GUTIERREZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LOPEZ DE LARA GUTIERREZ is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2012 to 31 Dec 2012
EL - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 6 - Geriatric Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Dec 2014
PostGrad Yr 7 - Geriatric Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Nov 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 28 Feb 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Aug 2013 |