THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 22:36:15 PM
Chan Tai Kong, Justin Brian
CPSO#:
99540
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
03 Nov 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Dublin Trinity College, 2012
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Unit 113, 385 Silver Star Blvd., Scarborough, Ontario M1V 0E3
Date Received: 01 Jun 2016
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:24 Oct 2014 |
CFPC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 29 Oct 2012 to 20 Jan 2013
AVP - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 21 Jan 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 28 Oct 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 29 Oct 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 28 Oct 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 29 Oct 2012 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 21 Jan 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 28 Oct 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 03 Nov 2014 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2016 |