THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 13:48:27 PM
Knyahnytska, Yuliya Oleksandrivna
CPSO#:
99533
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Sep 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
01 Sep 2017
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Russian, Ukrainian
Education: BUKOVINIAN STATE MEDICAL ACADEMY, 2000
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
752 King St W
Providence Care Hospital
Kingston ON K7L 4X3
Phone: (613) 544-4900
Electoral District: 06
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health |
Toronto |
Kingston Health Sciences Centre |
Kingston |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:13 Apr 2023 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 17 Oct 2012 to 08 Jan 2013
PEAP - CF - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 09 Jan 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 01 May 2014
CF - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 02 May 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 May 2015
CF - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jun 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
CF - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 31 Aug 2017
CF - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 17 Oct 2012 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 09 Jan 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 19 Oct 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 19 Oct 2015 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 05 May 2016 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 31 Aug 2017 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Sep 2017 |
Expiry as per terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Expiry Date: 31 Aug 2024 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 13 Apr 2023 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 13 Apr 2023 |
|
Active |