THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 9:46:48 AM
Webster, Lindsay Leigh Mary
CPSO#:
99528
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
22 Jun 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
22 Jun 2021
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland Sch, 2012
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
805 Blackburn Mews
Kingston ON K7P 2N6
Phone: 613-887-8733
Fax: 613-544-3288
Electoral District: 06
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Patient to contact office or hospital where seen by physician.
Date Received: 05 Jun 2019
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Kingston Health Sciences Centre |
Kingston |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:15 Oct 2014 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. LINDSAY LEIGH MARY WEBSTER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WEBSTER is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 23 Oct 2012 to 15 Jan 2013
AVP - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 16 Jan 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2013 to 22 Oct 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 23 Oct 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2014 to 22 Oct 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 13 Jan 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Obstetrical Surgical Skills)
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 23 Oct 2012 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 16 Jan 2013 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 16 Oct 2014 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jul 2019 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Jun 2021 |