THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 19:02:05 PM
Gantareddy, Susheel Reddy
CPSO#:
99527
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
09 Jan 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
09 Jan 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Telugu
Education: St. Matthew's University, 2011
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
201-182 Pinebush Rd
Cambridge ON N1R 8J8
Phone: 519 621 2424
Fax: 855 530 6121
Electoral District: 03
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:16 Dec 2014 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SUSHEEL REDDY GANTAREDDY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GANTAREDDY is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 22 Oct 2012 to 13 Jan 2013
AVP - Family Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 14 Jan 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2013 to 20 Oct 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 21 Oct 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2014 to 20 Oct 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 22 Oct 2012 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 14 Jan 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 20 Oct 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 09 Jan 2015 |