THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 23:04:14 PM
Lalji, Sonia
CPSO#:
99518
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
23 Oct 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
21 Oct 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Sehgal, Sonia (used until: 02 Jun 2016 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French, Hindi
Education: St. George's University School of Medici, 2012
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Grand River Hospital
835 King Street West
Kitchener ON N2G 1G3
Phone: (519) 749-4300
Electoral District: 03
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Grand River Hospital Corporation |
Kitchener |
St Mary's General Hospital |
Kitchener |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:15 Oct 2014 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SONIA LALJI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LALJI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 23 Oct 2012 to 14 Jan 2013
AVP - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 15 Jan 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 22 Oct 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 23 Oct 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 22 Oct 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - General Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Oct 2015
CF - Internal Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 23 Oct 2012 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jan 2013 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 21 Oct 2014 |