THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
30/04/24 7:45:15 AM
Cervantes Hernandez, Alejandra
CPSO#:
99514
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
23 Oct 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
06 May 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Spanish
Education: Autonomus University of Chihuahua, 2007
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Georgian Bay General Hospital
1112 St. Andrews Dr
Midland ON L4R 4P4
Phone: (705) 526-1300
Electoral District: 05
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. A. Cervantes Hernandez Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 9 2021
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Collingwood General and Marine Hospital |
Collingwood |
Georgian Bay General Hospital |
Midland |
Grey Bruce Health Services,Markdale Site |
Markdale |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:19 Jan 2015 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ALEJANDRA CERVANTES HERNANDEZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CERVANTES HERNANDEZ is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 23 Oct 2012 to 14 Jan 2013
AVP - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 15 Jan 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 22 Oct 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 23 Oct 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 12 Jan 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 13 Jan 2015 to 04 May 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)
University of Ottawa, 05 May 2015 to 01 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 23 Oct 2012 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jan 2013 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 06 May 2015 |