THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 14:32:03 PM
Tierney, Sarah Lynn
CPSO#:
99504
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
05 Feb 2018
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 2012
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
1053 Carling Avenue, Suite B312
Ottawa ON K1Y4E9
Phone: 613-798-5555
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Ottawa Hospital |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:30 Jun 2017 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SARAH LYNN TIERNEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TIERNEY is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 23 Oct 2012 to 19 Nov 2012
EL - Anesthesiology
University of Ottawa, 02 Jun 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
EL - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 24 Aug 2015 to 20 Sep 2015
EL - Anesthesiology
University of Ottawa, 15 Feb 2016 to 13 Mar 2016
EL - Anesthesiology
University of Ottawa, 21 Nov 2016 to 18 Dec 2016
EL - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
CF - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Oct 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 19 Nov 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 02 Jun 2015 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 24 Aug 2015 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 20 Sep 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Feb 2016 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 13 Mar 2016 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 21 Nov 2016 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 18 Dec 2016 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2017 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 05 Feb 2018 |