THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 21:47:38 PM
Harelnikava, Maryna Gennadievna
CPSO#:
99499
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
18 Aug 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
18 Aug 2022
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
Belarusian, English, Russian
Education: Belarusian State Medical University, 2004
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
PO Box 150
Manitoulin Central Family Health Te
2120 B Hwy 551
Mindemoya ON P0P 1S0
Phone: 7053775371
Fax: 1-855-908-2517
Electoral District: 08
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Manitoulin Health Centre,Mindemoya Site |
Mindemoya |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:16 Dec 2014 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MARYNA GENNADIEVNA HARELNIKAVA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HARELNIKAVA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 23 Oct 2012 to 14 Jan 2013
AVP - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 15 Jan 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 22 Oct 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 23 Oct 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 22 Oct 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 23 Oct 2012 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jan 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 22 Oct 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 12 Jan 2015 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 09 Aug 2022 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 18 Aug 2022 |