THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 7:49:08 AM
Sefin, Ashraf Akromen Morcos
CPSO#:
99498
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
22 Oct 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
22 Oct 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: Ain Shams University Faculty of Medicine, 1992
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
167 Hespeler Road
Cambridge ON N1R 3H7
Phone: (519) 623-4200
Fax: (519) 623-2546
Electoral District: 03
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Cambridge Memorial Hospital |
Cambridge |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:21 Oct 2014 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ASHRAF AKROMEN MORCOS SEFIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SEFIN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 22 Oct 2012 to 13 Jan 2013
AVP - Family Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 14 Jan 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2013 to 20 Oct 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 21 Oct 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2014 to 19 Oct 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 22 Oct 2012 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 14 Jan 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 19 Oct 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Oct 2014 |