THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 19:01:49 PM
Hamedanchi, Reza
CPSO#:
99492
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
14 Apr 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
14 Apr 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Iran Univ.of Med Sciences & Hlth Service, 2002
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
6175 Dunn St
Niagara Falls ON L2G 2P4
Phone: 905-773-3884
Electoral District: 04
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:For medical record requests, contact MCI The Doctors Office - Head Office at 416-440-4040.
Date Received: 13 Mar 2023
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:20 Dec 2012 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. REZA HAMEDANCHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAMEDANCHI is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 10 Oct 2012 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 10 Oct 2012 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 09 Oct 2015 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 14 Apr 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 14 Apr 2015 |