THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 23:28:29 PM
Zoueva, Svetlana
CPSO#:
99491
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
22 Dec 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Kemerovo State Medical Academy, 1991
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Rouge Valley Health System
Centenary Site
2867 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON M1E 4B9
Date Received: 29 May 2017
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - North Carolina
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:14 May 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 10 Oct 2012 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 10 Oct 2012 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 09 Oct 2015 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 22 Dec 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 22 Dec 2014 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 12 Nov 2015 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 12 Nov 2015 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2017 |