THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 10:14:00 AM
Duggan, Daniel Robert
CPSO#:
99485
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
07 Jan 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
07 Jan 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Ross University School of Medicine, 2012
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
705 Mackay Street
Pembroke ON K8A 1G8
Phone: 613-732-2811
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Pembroke Regional Hospital |
Pembroke |
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital |
Perth |
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital,Smiths Falls Community Site |
Smiths Falls |
Sensenbrenner Hospital |
Kapuskasing |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:22 Dec 2014 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DANIEL ROBERT DUGGAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DUGGAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 23 Oct 2012 to 14 Jan 2013
AVP - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 15 Jan 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 22 Oct 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 23 Oct 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Dec 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Anaesthesia)
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 23 Oct 2012 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jan 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Dec 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 07 Jan 2015 |