THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 8:44:20 AM
Nathoo, Sameer Bharat
CPSO#:
99478
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
04 Oct 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
04 Oct 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University College, Cork, 2008
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Medical Arts
179 James St S
Hamilton ON L8P 3A3
Phone: (905) 777-9779
Fax: (905) 777-9550
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site |
Hamilton |
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre |
Hamilton |
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton |
Hamilton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:11 Oct 2013 |
CFPC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 04 Oct 2012 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 04 Oct 2012 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 03 Apr 2014 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 28 Mar 2014 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 31 Jul 2014 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 31 Jul 2014 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 31 Jul 2014 |
|
Active |