THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 12:33:09 PM
Taheri, Sepideh
CPSO#:
99476
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
27 Nov 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
19 Dec 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Persian, Russian
Education: University of Edinburgh, 1989
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
L H S C Children's Hospital
Department of Pediatrics
Room B1-133
800 Commissioners Rd E
London ON N5A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8500 Ext. 56075
Fax: (519) 685-8156
Electoral District: 02
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
London Health Sciences Centre,Children's Hospital of Western Ontario |
London |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:04 Oct 2012 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 04 Oct 2012 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 04 Oct 2012 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 07 Dec 2013 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 11 Oct 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 19 Dec 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 19 Dec 2013 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 27 Nov 2020 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Jul 2022 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Jul 2022 |
|
Active |