THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 23:26:54 PM
Lemeshko, Olga Viktorivna
CPSO#:
99475
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
23 Oct 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
13 Oct 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Russian, Ukrainian
Education: Dniepropetrovsk State Medical Academy, 2000
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 200
1235 Trafalgar Road
Oakville ON L6H 3P1
Phone: (905) 844-3281
Fax: (905) 849-1076
Electoral District: 04
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:09 Oct 2015 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. OLGA VIKTORIVNA LEMESHKO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEMESHKO is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 23 Oct 2012 to 14 Jan 2013
AVP - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 15 Jan 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 22 Oct 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 23 Oct 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 06 Apr 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 07 Apr 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 19 Oct 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 23 Oct 2012 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jan 2013 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 13 Oct 2015 |