THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 6:30:40 AM
Hou Liu, Zhe Nana
CPSO#:
99451
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
19 Nov 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
19 Nov 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University College, Cork, 2012
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Markham Ellesmere Clinic
Suite 310
1920 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON M1H 2V6
Phone: 647-350-0550
Fax: 647-350-0552
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Campbellford Memorial Hospital |
Campbellford |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:24 Oct 2014 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ZHE NANA HOU LIU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOU LIU is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 29 Oct 2012 to 20 Jan 2013
AVP - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 21 Jan 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 28 Oct 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 29 Oct 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 28 Oct 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 29 Oct 2012 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 21 Jan 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 28 Oct 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Nov 2014 |