THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
30/04/24 19:56:20 PM
Surma, Beata
CPSO#:
99450
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
28 Sep 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
28 Sep 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Poznan University of Medical Sciences, 2004
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
28-1495 Cornwall Rd
Oakville ON L6J 0B2
Phone: (905) 273-7747
Fax: (905) 273-7757
Electoral District: 04
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - New York
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation |
Oakville |
Trillium Health Partners |
Mississauga |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:22 Aug 2014 |
CFPC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 28 Sep 2012 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 28 Sep 2012 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 27 Mar 2014 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Jan 2014 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 30 Jan 2014 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 26 Jan 2023 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 26 Jan 2023 |
|
Active |