THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 15:29:56 PM
Gott, William James
CPSO#:
99447
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Aug 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
01 Aug 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2011
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
55 Isla Street
Markdale ON N0C 1H0
Phone: (519) 986-3040
Electoral District: 03
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Alexandra Hospital |
Ingersoll |
Clinton Public Hospital |
Clinton |
Grey Bruce Health Services,Markdale Site |
Markdale |
Seaforth Community Hospital |
Seaforth |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:26 Jun 2013 |
CFPC Specialist |
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) |
Effective:10 Oct 2017 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. WILLIAM JAMES GOTT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOTT is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 26 Sep 2012 to 23 Oct 2012
EL - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
University of Toronto, 11 Apr 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 26 Sep 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 23 Oct 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Aug 2013 |