THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 21:25:18 PM
Sardana, Varun
CPSO#:
99446
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
04 Mar 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
04 Mar 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Bharati Vidyapeeth Deemed University, 2006
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Winston Park Family Physicians
2315 Bristol Circle, Suite 104
Oakville ON L6H 6P8
Phone: (905) 829-2826
Fax: (905) 829-2846
Electoral District: 04
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - New York
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:16 Dec 2014 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. VARUN SARDANA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SARDANA is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 28 Sep 2012 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 28 Sep 2012 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 27 Mar 2014 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 13 Mar 2014 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 23 May 2014 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 04 Mar 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 04 Mar 2015 |