THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 21:59:43 PM
Heywood, David
CPSO#:
99423
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
04 Jul 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
04 Jul 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 2011
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
St Catharines Hospital
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines ON L2S 0A9
Phone: 905-378-4647 Ext. 45000
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Niagara Health System - Port Colborne Site |
Port Colborne |
Niagara Health System - Welland Site |
Welland |
Niagara Health System |
Niagara Falls |
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site |
St Catharines |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:29 Jul 2013 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DAVID HEYWOOD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HEYWOOD is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 24 Sep 2012 to 14 Oct 2012
EL - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
McMaster University, 15 Oct 2012 to 03 Nov 2012
EL - Emergency Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 25 Sep 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 03 Nov 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 04 Jul 2013 |