THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 23:45:10 PM
Lujic, Jelka-Maria Irma
CPSO#:
99417
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Oct 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
01 Oct 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
Croatian, English, French, German
Education: Universite De Besancon, 1995
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital - Civic Campus
Department of Anaesthesia
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON K1Y 4E9
Phone: (613) 761-4169
Electoral District: 07
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
France
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Ottawa Hospital |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site |
Ottawa |
Royal Ottawa Health Care Group |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:01 Oct 2012 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Oct 2012 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Oct 2012 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 30 Sep 2019 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Jan 2014 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 06 Feb 2014 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Jan 2014 |
|
Active |