THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 21:36:56 PM
Zanette, Christopher George
CPSO#:
99405
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
22 Oct 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
31 Oct 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: National University of Ireland, 2012
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Royal Victoria Hospital
Emergency Department
201 Georgian Dr, Barrie, ON L4M 6M2
Barrie ON L4M 6M2
Phone: (705) 728-9802
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare,Huntsville District Memorial Hospital |
Huntsville |
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre |
Barrie |
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre |
Thunder Bay |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:21 Oct 2014 |
CFPC Specialist |
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) |
Effective:27 Oct 2015 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER GEORGE ZANETTE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZANETTE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 22 Oct 2012 to 13 Jan 2013
AVP - Family Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 14 Jan 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2013 to 20 Oct 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 21 Oct 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2014 to 19 Oct 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 20 Oct 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 22 Oct 2012 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 14 Jan 2013 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 31 Oct 2014 |