THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 15:44:34 PM
Tsang, Monica Chiu Wen
CPSO#:
99403
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
23 Nov 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
23 Nov 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
Chinese, English
Education: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicin, 2006
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
102-9160 Bayview Ave
Richmond Hill ON L4B 0E6
Phone: 9055978809
Fax: 289-870-2629
Electoral District: 05
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Unit 110
955 Major Mackenzie Drive West
Vaughan, ON L4A 4P9
Date Received: 30 Jun 2015
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:09 Jun 2011 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MONICA CHIU WEN TSANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TSANG is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 17 Sep 2012 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 10 Jun 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 Nov 2015 |