THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 7:11:29 AM
Leblanc, Marie-Claude
CPSO#:
99386
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
14 Jul 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
24 Sep 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Université Laval Faculté de Médecine, 2009
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:150 rue Saint-Thomas
Salaberry-de-Valleyfield, QC J6T 6C1
Date Received: 14 Jul 2015
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Orthopedic Surgery |
Effective:21 Sep 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 24 Sep 2012 to 21 Oct 2012
EL - Orthopedic Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 21 Sep 2014
EL - Orthopedic Surgery
McMaster University, 22 Sep 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Orthopedic Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 24 Sep 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 21 Oct 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2014 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 21 Sep 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Sep 2014 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 14 Jul 2015 |