THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 17:24:41 PM
Djuric, Vladimir
CPSO#:
99378
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
11 Sep 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
11 Sep 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Croatian, English, Serbian
Education: Medical College of Ohio at Toledo, 1990
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1200 Main St.
Michael G. DeGroote Pain Clinic
McMaster University Medical Centre
4th Floor Yellow Section 4V
Hamilton ON L8S 4L8
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 42590
Fax: 905-577-8022
Electoral District: 04
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Djuric Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 24 2018
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital |
Hamilton |
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site |
Hamilton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation |
Effective:11 Sep 2012 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 11 Sep 2012 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 11 Sep 2012 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 10 Mar 2014 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Jan 2014 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 13 Mar 2014 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 13 Mar 2014 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 13 Mar 2014 |
|
Active |