THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
30/04/24 5:30:55 AM
Kholdebarin, Ramin
CPSO#:
99375
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
25 Jul 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
30 Jun 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 2009
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2015 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 20 Sep 2012 to 17 Oct 2012
EL - Thoracic Surgery
University of Toronto, 06 Feb 2014 to 02 Apr 2014
EL - Surgical Oncology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - General Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 20 Sep 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 17 Oct 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 06 Feb 2014 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 02 Apr 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2015 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 25 Jul 2016 |