THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
30/04/24 5:55:08 AM
Mulaosmanovic, Armin
CPSO#:
99367
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
18 Dec 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
18 Dec 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Bosnian, English
Education: St. George's University School of Medici, 2012
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
3335 Dougall Ave.
Suite 103A
Windsor ON N9E 1S8
Phone: (519) 969-0580
Fax: (519) 966-1901
Electoral District: 01
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Windsor Regional Hospital |
Windsor |
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus |
Windsor |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:16 Dec 2014 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ARMIN MULAOSMANOVIC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MULAOSMANOVIC is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 23 Oct 2012 to 15 Jan 2013
AVP - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 16 Jan 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2013 to 22 Oct 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 23 Oct 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2014 to 22 Oct 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 23 Oct 2012 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 16 Jan 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 22 Oct 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 18 Dec 2014 |