THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 23:54:51 PM
Wesa, Mina
CPSO#:
99346
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
21 Jul 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
16 Jul 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Farsi, German
Education: University of British Columbia Faculty o, 2008
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Obstetrics and Gynecology |
Effective:30 Jun 2013 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 03 Sep 2012 to 28 Sep 2012
EL - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Ottawa, 01 Aug 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Jul 2014
CF - Obstetrics and Gynecology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 03 Sep 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 28 Sep 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 16 Jul 2013 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 21 Jul 2015 |