THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 2:43:20 AM
Mdallal, Ahmed Mahmoud Saleh
CPSO#:
99330
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of
23 Nov 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
24 Nov 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
ENGLISH
Education: Jordan University of Sci. & Technology, 2005
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Hospital Privileges
Hospital Notices
Source: Hospital
Active Date: August 6, 2014
Expiry Date:
Summary:
On August 13, 2014, Kingston General Hospital notified the College that Dr. Ahmed M.S. Mdallal's privileges were temporarily suspended at Kingston General Hospital and Hotel Dieu Hospital, effective August 6, 2014.
On August 25, 2014, Kingston General Hospital notified the College that Dr. Ahmed M.S. Mdallal's privileges are reinstated at Kingston General Hospital and Hotel Dieu Hospital, effective August 26, 2014.
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Sep 2012 to 23 Nov 2012
PEAP - CF - Nephrology
Queen's University, 24 Nov 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Nephrology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Nephrology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Aug 2014
CF - Nephrology
Queen's University, 01 Sep 2014 to 23 Nov 2014
CF - Nephrology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Sep 2012 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 24 Nov 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 23 Nov 2014 |