THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 21:34:33 PM
Denis, Rachelle Carolyn
CPSO#:
99322
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
02 Mar 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
02 Mar 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Ottawa, 2012
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
315 Pembroke Street East
Pembroke ON K8A 3K2
Phone: (613) 732-5777
Fax: (613) 735-7305
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Pembroke Regional Hospital |
Pembroke |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:16 Dec 2014 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. RACHELLE CAROLYN DENIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DENIS is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 27 Aug 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 26 Aug 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 27 Aug 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 22 Sep 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 23 Sep 2014 to 20 Oct 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 27 Aug 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 20 Oct 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 02 Mar 2015 |