THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 8:20:55 AM
Ali, Karim Firdous
CPSO#:
99307
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
23 Aug 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
23 Aug 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Urdu
Education: Ziauddin Medical University, 2004
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
St Catharines General
Niagara Health System
Department of Internal Medicine
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines ON L2S 0A9
Phone: (905) 378-4647
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Haldimand War Memorial Hospital |
Dunnville |
Niagara Health System - Fort Erie Site |
Fort Erie |
Niagara Health System - Port Colborne Site |
Port Colborne |
Niagara Health System - Welland Site |
Welland |
Niagara Health System |
Niagara Falls |
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site |
St Catharines |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:23 Aug 2012 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Infectious Diseases |
Effective:07 Aug 2014 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 23 Aug 2012 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 23 Aug 2012 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 22 Feb 2014 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Jan 2014 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Jan 2014 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 07 Aug 2014 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 27 Nov 2015 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 27 Nov 2015 |
|
Active |