THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 18:10:02 PM
Boulanger-Gobeil, Cindy
CPSO#:
99300
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of
30 Jun 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
01 Jul 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Université Laval Faculté de Médecine, 2010
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 27 Aug 2012 to 23 Sep 2012
EL - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 10 Feb 2014 to 07 Mar 2014
EL - Surgical Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 6 - Surgical Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 7 - Surgical Oncology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 27 Aug 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 23 Sep 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 10 Feb 2014 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 07 Mar 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2015 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2017 |